KS HB2148 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment benefits for privately contracted school bus drivers.
Title
Unemployment benefits for privately contracted school bus drivers.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Rhiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Motion to withdraw from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development not adopted - Yea: 44 Nay: 81 (Y: 44 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Motion to withdraw from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development not adopted; Yea: 44 Nay: 81 |
2020-02-25 | House | House Motion to withdraw from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development pending |
2019-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2019-02-06 | House | House Introduced |