KS HB2148 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating distinctive license plates for autism awareness and the Kansas 4-H foundation.
Title
Creating distinctive license plates for autism awareness and the Kansas 4-H foundation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 5 (Y: 120 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 09, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 5 |
2017-02-23 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 23, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 582-N |
2017-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-25 | House | House Introduced |