KS HB2142 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for reimbursement of property taxes from county government for business shutdown or capacity limitation caused by the county.
Title
Providing for reimbursement of property taxes from county government for business shutdown or capacity limitation caused by the county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-01-26 | House | House Introduced |