KS HB2139 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Postsecondary education; tuition and fees for aliens.
Title
Postsecondary education; tuition and fees for aliens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 24, 2015, 1:00 PM Room 112N |
2015-02-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2015-01-27 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2139/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2139_00_0000.pdf |