KS HB2125 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring licensees operating a motor vehicle to promptly deliver driver's license upon demand by authorized persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring licensees operating a motor vehicle to promptly deliver driver's license upon demand by authorized persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 115 Nay: 2 (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 10, 2019
2019-04-02HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
2019-03-21SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-21SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-21HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 115 Nay: 2
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-18HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
2019-02-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-02-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-04HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback