KS HB2119 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Senate Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for HB 2119 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget – Making and concerning appropriations for the department of education for fiscal years ending June 30, 2021, June 30, 2022, and June 30, 2023, creating and expanding school choice programs, restricting remote learning and remote enrollment and extending the statewide property tax levy for schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for HB 2119 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget – Making and concerning appropriations for the department of education for fiscal years ending June 30, 2021, June 30, 2022, and June 30, 2023, creating and expanding school choice programs, restricting remote learning and remote enrollment and extending the statewide property tax levy for schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 65 Nay: 58 (Y: 65 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2021-04-06SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-04-06HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, April 1, 2021
2021-03-30HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 65 Nay: 58
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Francis was adopted
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Francis
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoffman was adopted
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoffman
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Huebert was adopted
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Huebert
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith, A. was adopted
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Smith, A.
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Estes was adopted
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Estes
2021-03-10HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
2021-03-05HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-01HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2021-02-23HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2021-02-12HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2021-02-08HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 8, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
2021-02-04HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 4, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELED
2021-01-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2021-01-22HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hb2119/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2119_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2119_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2119_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2119_03_0000.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2119_h_1235.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2119_h_1477.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hb2119_h_2047.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hb2119_h_1816.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hb2119_h_1817.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hb2119_h_1695.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hb2119_h_2065.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2119_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2119_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2119_02_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2119_03_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210330195645_801197/

Bill Comments

feedback