KS HB2115 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for fair consideration for employment to persons with records of conviction.
Title
Providing for fair consideration for employment to persons with records of conviction.
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 06, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-19 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2115/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2115_00_0000.pdf |