KS HB2111 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax treatment of certain cash rebates on sales or leases of new motor vehicles.
Title
Sales tax treatment of certain cash rebates on sales or leases of new motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 111 Nay: 6 (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Reengrossed on Monday, May 7, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 111 Nay: 6 |
2018-05-04 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Senate Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen, and Senator Holland are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Billinger, and Senator Rogers on the Conference Committee |
2017-06-07 | House | House Representative Johnson, Representative Phillips, and Representative Sawyer are appointed to replace Representative Kelly, Representative Powell, and Representative Trimmer on the Conference Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Billinger and Senator Rogers appointed as conferees |
2017-04-03 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kelly , Representative Powell and Representative Trimmer as conferees |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-20 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-20 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, February 17, 2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2017-01-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2017-01-19 | House | House Introduced |