KS HB2110 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing single sales factor apportionment of business income for certain taxpayers.
Title
Allowing single sales factor apportionment of business income for certain taxpayers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-01-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-19 | House | House Introduced |