KS HB2093 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing criminal penalties for fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer when operating a stolen vehicle, committing certain driving violations or causing a collision involving another driver and making fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer evidence of intent to commit theft of a vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing criminal penalties for fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer when operating a stolen vehicle, committing certain driving violations or causing a collision involving another driver and making fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer evidence of intent to commit theft of a vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-22SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2021-03-16SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2021-02-26SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-25SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-02-25HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2021-02-25HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, February 24, 2021
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-27HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
2021-01-21HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-21HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hb2093/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2093_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2093_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2093_02_0000.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2093_h_1328.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2093_s_1942.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2093_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2093_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2093_02_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210225113816_203156/

Bill Comments

feedback