KS HB2089 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for HB 2089 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Standardizing firearm safety education training programs in school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for HB 2089 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Standardizing firearm safety education training programs in school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 79 Nay: 44 (Y: 79 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 31 Nay: 7 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 75 Nay: 47 (Y: 75 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoye was rejected - Yea: 39 Nay: 84 (Y: 39 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected - Yea: 47 Nay: 75 (Y: 47 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07HouseHouse No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
2021-05-03HouseHouse Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Thursday, April 22, 2021
2021-05-03HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
2021-05-03HouseHouse Reengrossed on Saturday, April 10, 2021
2021-04-08HouseHouse Concurred with amendments; Yea: 79 Nay: 44
2021-04-08SenateSenate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 31 Nay: 7
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Ware was rejected
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Ware
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Faust-Goudeau was rejected
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Faust-Goudeau
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-03-31SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2021-03-30SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-03-29SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, March 29, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2021-03-19SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-03-18HouseHouse Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 75 Nay: 47
2021-03-18HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, March 17, 2021
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2021-03-17HouseHouse Representative Arnberger raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Bishop
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoye was rejected Yea: 39 Nay: 84
2021-03-17HouseHouse Representative Barker raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoye
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected Yea: 47 Nay: 75
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highberger
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2021-03-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-01-27HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2021-01-21HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-01-21HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hb2089/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2089_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2089_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2089_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2089_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2089_h_1677.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hb2089_h_1772.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hb2089_h_1765.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hb2089_h_1773.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2089_s_2077.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hb2089_s_2111.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_hb2089_s_2112.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2089_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2089_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2089_02_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_hb_2089_2021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210317114157_159431/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210317120107_459883/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210318112629_737934/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210408110428_842258/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210408212910_296949/

Bill Comments

feedback