KS HB2080 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reinstatement of forfeited benefit units of rural water districts.
Title
Reinstatement of forfeited benefit units of rural water districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 118 Nay: 6 (Y: 118 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 112 Nay: 13 (Y: 112 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 112 Nay: 13 (Y: 112 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2017 |
2017-05-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2017 |
2017-04-07 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, April 6, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 118 Nay: 6 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Kerschen, Senator Estes and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees |
2017-03-28 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Sloan , Representative Rahjes and Representative Victors as conferees |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 09, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 112 Nay: 13 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-02-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Water and Environment |
2017-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 582-N |
2017-01-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water and Environment |
2017-01-18 | House | House Introduced |