KS HB2068 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas power of attorney act regarding durable power of attorney and duties of the attorney in fact.
Title
Amending the Kansas power of attorney act regarding durable power of attorney and duties of the attorney in fact.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2011-01-28 | Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced |