KS HB2060 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax, food sales tax refund, excluding certain confined persons; Homestead property tax refund, excluding certain confined persons, computation of refund; earned income credit.
Title
Sales tax, food sales tax refund, excluding certain confined persons; Homestead property tax refund, excluding certain confined persons, computation of refund; earned income credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 25 Nay: 15 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 27 (Y: 9 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected - Yea: 8 Nay: 30 (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 14 Nay: 26 (Y: 14 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 9 Nay: 27 (Y: 9 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected - Yea: 8 Nay: 30 (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected - Yea: 14 Nay: 26 (Y: 14 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in Conference |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Senator Donovan replaces Senator Bruce on the Conference Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | House Representative Sawyer replaces Representative Menghini on the Conference Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | House Representative Edmonds replaces Representative Schwab on the Conference Committee |
2014-03-31 | House | House Representative Carlson replaces Representative Carlson on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-28 | House | House Representative Schwab replaces Representative Siegfreid on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate Senator Bruce replaces Senator Donovan on the Conference Committee |
2013-05-22 | House | House Representative Siegfreid replaces Representative Schwab on the Conference Committee |
2013-04-04 | House | House Representative Menghini replaces Representative Sawyer on the Conference Committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Donovan, Senator Tyson and Senator Holland appointed as conferees |
2013-04-02 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Carlson , Representative Schwab and Representative Sawyer as conferees |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 25 Nay: 15 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 9 Nay: 27 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected Yea: 8 Nay: 30 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected Yea: 14 Nay: 26 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 26, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-07 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-07 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, 06 February 2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2013-02-04 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-01-28 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2013-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2013-01-23 | House | House Introduced |