KS HB2056 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Pending: Senate Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Regulating the sale and distribution of kratom products as a part of and supplemental to the Kansas food, drug and cosmetic act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating the sale and distribution of kratom products as a part of and supplemental to the Kansas food, drug and cosmetic act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 97 Nay: 24 (Y: 97 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-05-07SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-05-06HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 97 Nay: 24
2021-05-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2021-05-06HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2021-02-01HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-01-26HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2021-01-13HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-01-13HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback