KS HB2049 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 18 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2049 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare -- Controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2049 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare -- Controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 3 (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 3 (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 2 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 2 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 2 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 2 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 113 Nay: 8 (Y: 113 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 113 Nay: 8 (Y: 113 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-01 Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 18 May 2011
2011-06-01 Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 13, 2011
2011-05-10 Reengrossed on Thursday, 05 May 2011
2011-05-03 Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 3
2011-05-03 Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2011-04-29 Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 2
2011-04-29 Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2011-04-29 Conference committee report now available
2011-04-28 Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Brungardt and Senator Kelly appointed as 2nd conferees
2011-04-27 Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Colloton, Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller appointed as 2 conferees
2011-04-01 Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 2
2011-04-01 Conference committee report now available
2011-03-22 Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Brungardt and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees
2011-03-21 Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
2011-03-17 Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 36 Nay: 1
2011-03-16 Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2011-03-16 Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
2011-03-16 Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
2011-03-15 Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2011-03-15 Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2011-03-07 Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2011-02-22 Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2011-05-11 Engrossed on Monday, 14 February 2011
2011-02-10 Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2011-02-09 Received and Introduced
2011-02-07 Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 113 Nay: 8
2011-02-04 Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2011-02-04 Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2011-01-31 Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2011-01-21 Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2011-01-20 Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/hb2049/
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/m/pdf/hb2049_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2049_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2049_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2049_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2049_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/year1/measures/odt_view/je_20110207123309_922825/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/year1/measures/odt_view/je_20110317145432_611539/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/year1/measures/odt_view/je_20110401110351_318346/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/year1/measures/odt_view/je_20110429112358_551550/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/year1/measures/odt_view/je_20110503103345_833905/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20110207123309_922825/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20110317145432_611539/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20110401110351_318346/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20110429112358_551550/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/odt_view/je_20110503103345_833905/

Bill Comments

feedback