KS HB2037 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Veterans and Military
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to the veterans benefit lottery games, creating the veterans benefit lottery game fund and transferring moneys to veterans service programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the veterans benefit lottery games, creating the veterans benefit lottery game fund and transferring moneys to veterans service programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Veterans and Military
2019-02-12HouseHouse Hearing continuation: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
2019-02-05HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
2019-01-29HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 29, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED
2019-01-25HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military
2019-01-17HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-01-17HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback