KS HB2031 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing good time and program credits for certain offenders.
Title
Increasing good time and program credits for certain offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 25, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
2021-01-11 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 31, 2020 |