KS HB2030 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - House Hearing: Friday, January 12, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELED
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - House Hearing: Friday, January 12, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELED
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing nonpublic school students to participate in activities regulated by the Kansas state high school activities association and allowing nonpublic school students who enroll part time in a public school to participate in nonpublic school activities.
Title
Authorizing nonpublic school students to participate in activities regulated by the Kansas state high school activities association and allowing nonpublic school students who enroll part time in a public school to participate in nonpublic school activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-12 | House | House Hearing: Friday, January 12, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELED |
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on K-12 Education Budget; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2023-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-01-13 | House | House Introduced |