KS HB2028 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Saturday, May 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2028 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Establishing the Kansas telemedicine act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2028 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Establishing the Kansas telemedicine act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 107 Nay: 13 (Y: 107 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 32 Nay: 6 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Hawkins, Representative Concannon and Representative Murnan appointed as second conferees - Yea: 75 Nay: 45 (Y: 75 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 24 Nay: 14 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-07 - Senate - Senate Motion to return bill to conference failed. - Yea: 20 Nay: 20 (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 2 (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Saturday, May 12, 2018
2018-05-04HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 04, 2018
2018-05-01HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, May 1, 2018
2018-04-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 107 Nay: 13
2018-04-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 6
2018-04-30SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2018-04-27HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Concannon and Representative Murnan appointed as third conferees
2018-04-26SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Estes and Senator Kelly appointed as third conferees
2018-04-26HouseHouse Representative Horn is appointed to replace Representative Murnan on the Conference Committee
2018-04-26SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Estes and Senator Kelly appointed as second conferees
2018-04-26SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-07HouseHouse Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Hawkins, Representative Concannon and Representative Murnan appointed as second conferees Yea: 75 Nay: 45
2018-04-07HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-07SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 24 Nay: 14
2018-04-07SenateSenate Motion to return bill to conference failed. Yea: 20 Nay: 20
2018-04-07SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-04-07SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2018-04-03SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Bollier and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees
2018-04-02HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hawkins , Representative Concannon and Representative Murnan as conferees
2018-03-29SenateSenate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
2018-03-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2018-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2017-03-08SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
2017-01-31SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2017-01-30SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2017-01-30HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 2
2017-01-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2017-01-18HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services
2017-01-17HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 17, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
2017-01-11HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2017-01-11HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2028/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2028_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2028_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2028_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2028_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170130112515_035527/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180329111948_349158/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180407112523_383935/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180407114753_246494/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180407170423_167978/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180430153837_651407/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180430164217_255952/

Bill Comments

feedback