KS HB2021 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the issuance of bonds for the construction of a state veterans home and expanding educational benefits of tuition and fees waiver for spouses and dependents of public safety officers and personnel who are injured or disabled while performing service-related duties.
Title
Authorizing the issuance of bonds for the construction of a state veterans home and expanding educational benefits of tuition and fees waiver for spouses and dependents of public safety officers and personnel who are injured or disabled while performing service-related duties.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Proctor [R] | Rep. Chris Croft [R] | Rep. Ronald Ellis [R] | Rep. David French [R] |
Rep. Timothy Johnson [R] | Rep. Lance Neelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 3 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 1 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 2 (Y: 121 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 1 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 2 (Y: 121 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Reengrossed on Monday, April 12, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 3 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 1 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Billinger, Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees |
2021-04-07 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Waymaster , Representative Hoffman and Representative Wolfe Moore as conferees |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 25, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-17 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 2 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative T. Johnson was adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative T. Johnson |
2021-02-10 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED |
2021-01-27 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2021-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
2021-01-11 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 31, 2020 |