KS HB2021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing insurance coverage for hearing aids.
Title
Providing insurance coverage for hearing aids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N - CANCELLED |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hearing: (opponents) Thursday, February 02, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2017-01-27 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2017-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N - CANCELLED |
2017-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N |
2017-01-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-01-10 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2021/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2021_00_0000.pdf |