KS HB2016 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 8, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the governmental response to the 2020 COVID-19 pandemic in Kansas and providing certain relief related to health, welfare, property and economic security during this public health emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the governmental response to the 2020 COVID-19 pandemic in Kansas and providing certain relief related to health, welfare, property and economic security during this public health emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 26 Nay: 12 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Motion to Call the Question - Yea: 19 Nay: 17 (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 107 Nay: 12 (Y: 107 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Clayton was rejected - Yea: 40 Nay: 76 (Y: 40 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pittman was rejected - Yea: 57 Nay: 63 (Y: 57 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Curtis was rejected - Yea: 38 Nay: 81 (Y: 38 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained - Yea: 76 Nay: 43 (Y: 76 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Motion to advance the bill to Emergency Final Action subject to amendment and debate adopted. - Yea: 88 Nay: 30 (Y: 88 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-04HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Monday, June 8, 2020
2020-06-04HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, June 5, 2020
2020-06-04SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 26 Nay: 12
2020-06-04SenateSenate Motion to Call the Question Yea: 19 Nay: 17
2020-06-04SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2020-06-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-06-03SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2020-06-03HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 107 Nay: 12
2020-06-03HouseHouse Amendment by Representative Ralph was adopted
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ralph
2020-06-03HouseHouse Ruling of the chair was sustained
2020-06-03HouseHouse Representative Carpenter, B. raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2020-06-03HouseHouse Amendment by Representative Clayton was rejected Yea: 40 Nay: 76
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Clayton
2020-06-03HouseHouse Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ousley
2020-06-03HouseHouse Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael
2020-06-03HouseHouse Amendment by Representative Pittman was rejected Yea: 57 Nay: 63
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Pittman
2020-06-03HouseHouse Amendment by Representative Rhiley was rejected
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Rhiley
2020-06-03HouseHouse Amendment by Representative Curtis was rejected Yea: 38 Nay: 81
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Curtis
2020-06-03HouseHouse Ruling of the chair was sustained Yea: 76 Nay: 43
2020-06-03HouseHouse Representative Landwehr raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to refer to committee on Judiciary failed.
2020-06-03HouseHouse Motion to advance the bill to Emergency Final Action subject to amendment and debate adopted. Yea: 88 Nay: 30
2020-06-03HouseHouse Bill referred to the Committee of the Whole
2020-06-03HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/hb2016/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/documents/hb2016_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/documents/hb2016_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/documents/hb2016_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/vote_view/je_20200603165928_407277/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/vote_view/je_20200603191319_600807/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/vote_view/je_20200603193940_914019/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/vote_view/je_20200603200644_713243/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/vote_view/je_20200603204548_103847/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/vote_view/je_20200603210950_181372/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/vote_view/je_20200604141050_776720/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li_2020s/b2020s/measures/vote_view/je_20200604152650_575118/

Bill Comments

feedback