KS HB2015 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile offenders; prohibiting placement in a juvenile correctional facility for a current misdemeanor adjudication.
Title
Juvenile offenders; prohibiting placement in a juvenile correctional facility for a current misdemeanor adjudication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 22, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 152S |
2015-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2015/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2015_00_0000.pdf |