KS HB2011 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the authority of the secretary of state to prosecute election crimes.
Title
Removing the authority of the secretary of state to prosecute election crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-01-13 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Elections; Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2021-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
2021-01-11 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 22, 2020 |