KS HB2007 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations for FY 2021, FY 2022, FY 2023 and FY 2024 for various state agencies.
Title
Appropriations for FY 2021, FY 2022, FY 2023 and FY 2024 for various state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 80(e) overridden - Yea: 104 Nay: 20 (Y: 104 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 163(a) overridden - Yea: 84 Nay: 40 (Y: 84 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 87a overridden - Yea: 84 Nay: 40 (Y: 84 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 30(c) overridden - Yea: 86 Nay: 38 (Y: 86 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 71 Nay: 52 (Y: 71 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 21 Nay: 14 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 163(a) overridden - Yea: 84 Nay: 40 (Y: 84 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 87a overridden - Yea: 84 Nay: 40 (Y: 84 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 30(c) overridden - Yea: 86 Nay: 38 (Y: 86 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 71 Nay: 52 (Y: 71 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 21 Nay: 14 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained |
2021-05-03 | House | House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 80(e) overridden; Yea: 104 Nay: 20 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 163(a) overridden; Yea: 84 Nay: 40 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 87a overridden; Yea: 84 Nay: 40 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 30(c) overridden; Yea: 86 Nay: 38 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor except line item veto of Sections 4(b), 29(d), 30(c), 31(a), 69(j), 70(i), 71(a), 72(a), 84(a), 84(t), 84(w), 85(a), 101(a), 103(d), 104(d), 121(a), 121 (f), 122(h), 140, 141, 142, 143 and 163(a); portions of sections 30(a), 80(e) and 87(a) on Monday, April 26, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, April 12, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 71 Nay: 52 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 21 Nay: 14 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-04-06 | House | House Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman, and Representative Wolfe Moore are appointed to replace Representative Proehl, Representative Delperdang, and Representative Helgerson on the Conference Committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Senator Billinger is appointed to replace Senator Petersen on the Conference Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees |
2021-03-30 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Delperdang and Representative Helgerson as conferees |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-18 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-03 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 26, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-01-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-11 | House | House Introduced |
2021-01-11 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 17, 2020 |