KS HB2006 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Committee Report recommending the bill be not passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Committee Report recommending the bill be not passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal of K.S.A. 76-731a, which grants residency for tuition purposes to certain aliens who are unlawfully present in the United States.
Title
Repeal of K.S.A. 76-731a, which grants residency for tuition purposes to certain aliens who are unlawfully present in the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 72 Nay: 50 (Y: 72 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 72 Nay: 50 (Y: 72 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 72 Nay: 50 (Y: 72 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Committee Report recommending the bill be not passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2011-02-22 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-22 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 72 Nay: 50 | |
2011-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-02-11 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced | |
2011-01-10 | Prefiled for Introduction |