KS HB2003 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - House Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
Pending: House Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the limited driver's license and identification card for certain individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the limited driver's license and identification card for certain individuals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-01HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Transportation; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-01-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-14HouseHouse Introduced
2019-01-14HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, December 26, 2018

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback