KS HB2002 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 10, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 10, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing countywide retailers' sales tax authority for Dickinson and Grant counties, providing for a sales tax exemption for area agencies on aging and purchases made by Kansas suicide prevention HQ, inc., providing that the secretary of revenue file a release of warrant in the county where such warrant is docketed, granting authority to the director of property valuation to develop qualifying courses and providing that certain tax notices and statements may be transmitted by electronic means by the county treasurer and county appraiser if consented to by the taxpayer.
Title
Providing countywide retailers' sales tax authority for Dickinson and Grant counties, providing for a sales tax exemption for area agencies on aging and purchases made by Kansas suicide prevention HQ, inc., providing that the secretary of revenue file a release of warrant in the county where such warrant is docketed, granting authority to the director of property valuation to develop qualifying courses and providing that certain tax notices and statements may be transmitted by electronic means by the county treasurer and county appraiser if consented to by the taxpayer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 114 Nay: 7 (Y: 114 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 6 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 114 Nay: 7 (Y: 114 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, May 10, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 5, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2023-04-27 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Peck and Senator Holland appointed as conferees |
2023-04-03 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Smith, A. , Representative Bergkamp and Representative Sawyer as conferees |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 6 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 20, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-03-09 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 114 Nay: 7 |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-02-09 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-24 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-01-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-09 | House | House Introduced |
2023-01-09 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, December 14, 2022 |