KS H2676 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Approved by gov. -HJ 1218
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Approved by gov. -HJ 1218
Summary
Employment security law; contribution rates option; no penalties or interest up to 90 days late. Effective date: April 1, 2010.
Title
Employment security law; contribution rates option; no penalties or interest up to 90 days late. Effective date: April 1, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Approved by gov. -HJ 1218 | |
2010-03-15 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 1135 | |
2010-03-10 | Concurred; Yeas 122 Nays 0 -HJ 1079; Reengrossed -HJ 1101 | |
2010-03-04 | COW:; CR not Adptd, back on the bill as passed by House; Be am.; Be passed as am. -SJ 1132; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 39 Nays 0 -SJ 1133 | |
2010-03-02 | CR: Substitute be passed by Business and Labor -SJ 1117 | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Business and Labor -SJ 1104 | |
2010-02-24 | Received and introduced -SJ 1100 | |
2010-02-19 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 122 Nays 0 -HJ 1006 | |
2010-02-18 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 973; Engrossed -HJ 987 | |
2010-02-17 | COW: Be passed over and retain a place on calendar -HJ 952 | |
2010-02-15 | CR: Be passed as am. by Commerce and Labor -HJ 927 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Commerce and Labor -HJ 901; Hearing: Thurs., 2/11/2010, 9:00AM, Rm 784 Docking | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced -HJ 899 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |