KS H2619 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Approved by gov. -HJ 1296
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Approved by gov. -HJ 1296
Summary
Registered nurse anesthetists duties. Effective date: July 1, 2010.
Title
Registered nurse anesthetists duties. Effective date: July 1, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Approved by gov. -HJ 1296 | |
2010-03-16 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 1135 | |
2010-03-11 | COW: Be passed -SJ 1176; EFA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1184 | |
2010-03-09 | CR: Be passed by Public Health and Welfare -SJ 1148 | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Public Health and Welfare -SJ 1105 | |
2010-02-24 | Received and introduced -SJ 1100 | |
2010-02-23 | Engrossed -HJ 1010 | |
2010-02-19 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 121 Nays 0 -HJ 1003 | |
2010-02-18 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 985 | |
2010-02-17 | CR: Be passed as am. by Health and Human Services -HJ 954 | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing: Tues., 2/16/2010, 1:30 PM, Rm 784 Docking | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Health and Human Services -HJ 860; Hearing: Mon., 2/8/2010, 1:30 PM, Rm 784 Docking | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced -HJ 858 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |