KS H2612 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Concerning drivers' licenses, restrictions and judgments of restitution. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Concerning drivers' licenses, restrictions and judgments of restitution. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 860; Hearing: Wed., 2/10/2010, 3:30 PM, Rm 346-S | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced -HJ 857 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |