KS H2596 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Secretary of health and environment; rules and regulations regarding remediation of lead-based paint. Effective date: KS Register.
Title
Secretary of health and environment; rules and regulations regarding remediation of lead-based paint. Effective date: KS Register.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-18 | COW: -HJ 985; Be referred to Federal and State Affairs -HJ 985 | |
2010-02-17 | CR: Be passed as am. by Commerce and Labor -HJ 952 | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing: Mon., 2/15/2010, 9:00 AM, Rm 784 Docking | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Commerce and Labor -HJ 860 | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced -HJ 853 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |