KS H2544 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Approved by gov. -HJ 1382
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Approved by gov. -HJ 1382
Summary
State public trust, superfund sites, Cherokee county, member compensation for meeting attendance. Effective date: April 15, 2010.
Title
State public trust, superfund sites, Cherokee county, member compensation for meeting attendance. Effective date: April 15, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Approved by gov. -HJ 1382 | |
2010-03-29 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 1309 | |
2010-03-23 | COW: Be passed -SJ 1247; EFA: Passed; Yeas 39 Nays 1 -SJ 1256 | |
2010-03-18 | CR: Be passed by Ways and Means -SJ 1219 | |
2010-03-05 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1135 | |
2010-03-04 | Received and introduced -SJ 1129 | |
2010-03-04 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 106 Nays 7 -HJ 1038 | |
2010-03-03 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 1035; Engrossed -HJ 1060 | |
2010-02-23 | CR: Be passed as am. by Appropriations -HJ 1009 | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing: Wed., 2/17/2010, 9:00 AM, Rm 346-S | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing: Mon., 2/8/2010, 9:00 AM, Rm 346-S | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Appropriations -HJ 837 | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced -HJ 834 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |