KS H2515 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Killed, Final Action
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Killed, Final Action
Summary
Prohibition against a municipality requiring the installation of a multi-purpose sprinkler system in a residential structure. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Prohibition against a municipality requiring the installation of a multi-purpose sprinkler system in a residential structure. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Killed, Final Action | |
2010-02-19 | FA: Not passed; Yeas 60 Nays 62 -HJ 998 | |
2010-02-18 | Motion to reconsider adptd -HJ 982; COW: -HJ 982; Be passed as am. -HJ 982 | |
2010-02-17 | COW: -HJ 956; CR be adptd -HJ 956; Motion to recommend for passage, failed -HJ 956; Engrossed -HJ 987 | |
2010-02-10 | CR: Be passed as am. by Local Government -HJ 907 | |
2010-01-28 | Hearing: Thurs., 2/4/2010, 3:30PM, Rm 144-S | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to Local Government -HJ 828 | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced -HJ 826 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |