KS H2469 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Approved by gov. -HJ 1300
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Approved by gov. -HJ 1300
Summary
Use of prior convictions in determining criminal history. Effective date: April 8, 2010.
Title
Use of prior convictions in determining criminal history. Effective date: April 8, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Approved by gov. -HJ 1300 | |
2010-03-23 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 1254 | |
2010-03-22 | Concurred; Yeas 119 Nays 0 -HJ 1191; Engrossed -HJ 1219 | |
2010-03-17 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1204 | |
2010-03-16 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1200 | |
2010-03-15 | CR: Be passed as am. by Judiciary -SJ 1189 | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 1023 | |
2010-02-11 | Received and introduced -SJ 1014 | |
2010-02-11 | FA: Passed; Yeas 120 Nays 0 -HJ 912 | |
2010-02-10 | COW: Be passed -HJ 905 | |
2010-02-04 | Withdrawn from consent calendar; placed on general orders -HJ 874 | |
2010-02-03 | CR: Be passed & placed on consent calendar by Corrections and Juvenile Justice -HJ 868 | |
2010-01-25 | Hearing: Thurs., 1/28/2010, 1:30PM, Rm 144-S | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Corrections and Juvenile Justice -HJ 817 | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced -HJ 814 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |