KS H2414 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Approved by gov. -HJ 980
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Approved by gov. -HJ 980
Summary
Authorization for Fort Hays State University to sell land. Effective date: February 25, 2010.
Title
Authorization for Fort Hays State University to sell land. Effective date: February 25, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Approved by gov. -HJ 980 | |
2010-02-16 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 962 | |
2010-02-12 | Concurred; Yeas 101 Nays 0 -HJ 920; Engrossed -HJ 930 | |
2010-02-10 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1009 | |
2010-02-09 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1002 | |
2010-02-03 | CR: Be passed as am. by Ways and Means -SJ 986 | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 965 | |
2010-01-27 | Received and introduced -SJ 955 | |
2010-01-27 | FA: Passed; Yeas 118 Nays 0 -HJ 839 | |
2010-01-21 | CR: Be passed & placed on consent calendar by Education Budget -HJ 825 | |
2010-01-15 | Hearing: Wed., 1/20/10, 3:30PM, Rm 159-S | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced -HJ 790; Referred to Education Budget -HJ 791 | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |