KS H2364 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Approved by gov. -HJ 1218
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Approved by gov. -HJ 1218
Summary
Court procedure; time limitations for filing. Effective date: April 1, 2010.
Title
Court procedure; time limitations for filing. Effective date: April 1, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Approved by gov. -HJ 1218 | |
2010-03-15 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 1135 | |
2010-03-10 | FA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1154 | |
2010-03-04 | CR: Be passed & placed on consent calendar by Judiciary -SJ 1130 | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 1028 | |
2010-02-15 | Received and introduced -SJ 1025 | |
2010-02-15 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 119 Nays 0 -HJ 923 | |
2010-02-12 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 918; Engrossed -HJ 930 | |
2010-02-09 | CR: Be passed as am. by Judiciary -HJ 894 | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing: Mon., 2/1/2010, 3:30PM, Rm 346-S | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 257 | |
2009-03-04 | Introduced -HJ 255 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |