KS H2353 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Approved by gov. -HJ 980
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - Approved by gov. -HJ 980
Summary
S Sub for H 2353 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation--Validation of election granting sales tax authority for Chautauqua county. Effective date: February 25, 2010.
Title
S Sub for H 2353 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation--Validation of election granting sales tax authority for Chautauqua county. Effective date: February 25, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Approved by gov. -HJ 980 | |
2010-02-16 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 948 | |
2010-02-11 | Adptd CCR on house bill; Yeas 111 Nays 9 -HJ 912; Engrossed -HJ 921 | |
2010-02-09 | Adptd CCR; Yeas 37 Nays 2 -SJ 1001 | |
2010-02-01 | Acceded; apptd Donovan, D.Schmidt, Holland -SJ 970 | |
2010-02-01 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Carlson, King, Menghini -HJ 851 | |
2010-01-27 | COW: CR recommending sub. bill be adptd; Sub. be passed -SJ 958; EFA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 961 | |
2010-01-20 | CR: Substitute be passed by Assessment and Taxation -SJ 935 | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assessment and Taxation -SJ 532 | |
2009-03-25 | Received and introduced -SJ 507 | |
2009-03-25 | Engrossed -HJ 440; FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 125 Nays 0 -HJ 417 | |
2009-03-24 | COW: Be am.; be passed as am. -HJ 402 | |
2009-03-20 | COW: Be passed over and retain a place on calendar -HJ 355 | |
2009-03-11 | CR: Be passed by Taxation -HJ 276 | |
2009-02-25 | Hearing: Wed., 3/4/09, 9:00AM, Rm 535-N | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Taxation -HJ 206 | |
2009-02-19 | Introduced -HJ 194 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |