KS H2331 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by gov. -HJ 663
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by gov. -HJ 663
Summary
State treasurer; investment of state moneys. Effective date: July 1, 2009.
Title
State treasurer; investment of state moneys. Effective date: July 1, 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Approved by gov. -HJ 663 | |
2009-04-13 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 667 | |
2009-04-03 | COW: Be passed -SJ 698; EFA: Passed; Yeas 39 Nays 0 -SJ 699 | |
2009-04-02 | Withdrawn from Financial Institutions and Insurance -SJ 591; Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 591; CR: Be passed by Ways and Means -SJ 613 | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Financial Institutions and Insurance -SJ 540 | |
2009-03-30 | Received and introduced -SJ 537 | |
2009-03-30 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 123 Nays 0 -HJ 443 | |
2009-03-26 | Engrossed -HJ 449 | |
2009-03-25 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 433 | |
2009-03-19 | CR: Be passed as am. by General Government Budget -HJ 343 | |
2009-03-11 | Hearing: Mon., 3/16/09, 1:30 PM, Rm 531-N | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to General Government Budget -HJ 152 | |
2009-02-11 | Introduced -HJ 151 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |