KS H2305 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Manufactured homes and mobile homes, treated as real property, when. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Manufactured homes and mobile homes, treated as real property, when. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2009-02-18 | Hearing: Wed., 2/25/09, 3:30PM, Rm 143-N | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 136 | |
2009-02-06 | Introduced -HJ 134 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |