KS H2155 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by gov. -HJ 663
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by gov. -HJ 663
Summary
City land banks. Effective date: July 1, 2009.
Title
City land banks. Effective date: July 1, 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Approved by gov. -HJ 663 | |
2009-04-13 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -HJ 667 | |
2009-04-06 | Engrossed -HJ 667 | |
2009-04-03 | Concurred; Yeas 105 Nays 19 -HJ 636; Requested senate to return | |
2009-03-31 | Acceded; apptd Reitz, Wagle, Kultala -SJ 566 | |
2009-03-30 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Schwartz, M.Holmes, Garcia -HJ 449 | |
2009-03-25 | COW: Be am.; be passed as am. -SJ 499; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 34 Nays 6 -SJ 528 | |
2009-03-16 | CR: Be passed by Local Government -SJ 329 | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Local Government -SJ 240 | |
2009-02-24 | Received and introduced -SJ 238 | |
2009-02-20 | FA: Passed; Yeas 81 Nays 38 -HJ 208 | |
2009-02-19 | COW: Be passed -HJ 199 | |
2009-02-18 | CR: Be passed by Local Government -HJ 188 | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Local Government -HJ 82 | |
2009-01-29 | Introduced -HJ 78 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |