IN SB0371 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Probate matters. Provides that an individual otherwise qualified for certain property tax deductions for property that the individual occupies as a beneficiary of the trust that owns the property is not required to be considered the owner of the property under the rules of construction for the property tax law for the trust to receive the property tax deduction. Transfers certain inheritance tax duties from the probate court, county assessor, and county treasurer to the department of state revenue with respect to inheritance tax returns filed after March 31, 2016. Revises the inheritance tax allocation statute so that the current

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probate matters. Provides that an individual otherwise qualified for certain property tax deductions for property that the individual occupies as a beneficiary of the trust that owns the property is not required to be considered the owner of the property under the rules of construction for the property tax law for the trust to receive the property tax deduction. Transfers certain inheritance tax duties from the probate court, county assessor, and county treasurer to the department of state revenue with respect to inheritance tax returns filed after March 31, 2016. Revises the inheritance tax allocation statute so that the current

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-22 - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 190
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-02-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-02-23HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2016-02-22HouseRepresentative Hamm added as cosponsor
2016-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 94, nays 0
2016-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-15HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-01SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2016-02-01SenateSenator Taylor added as coauthor
2016-02-01SenateSenator Zakas added as second author
2016-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Koch
2016-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-01-28SenateAmendment #1 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote
2016-01-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2016-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/371/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/d/1/60d18aee/SB0371.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/3/9/6139faba/SB0371.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/2/2/df2237cf/SB0371.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/c/4/83c4f635/SB0371.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/b/e/44be6416/SB0371.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/3/9/a5398c32/SB0371.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/3/d/673d1828/SB0371.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/d/9/04d9500b/SB0371.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/9/7/fd9756a0/SB0371.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/c/a/77ca5a74/SB0371.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/d/5/bcd5b552/SB0371.116.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/b/d/e2bdd0c2/SB0371.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/8/9/6e8954a7/SB0371.213.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback