IN SB0193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sewer and water connections. Provides that a unit may not prohibit a property owner from installing a sewer line or other sewage works: (1) in or through a public right-of-way owned or controlled by the unit; and (2) for the purpose of connecting the owner's property to a sewer system owned or operated by another unit or entity; if the owner provides to the unit a written determination from a specified authority that the owner's existing sewage disposal system is failing, and if certain other conditions are met. Provides that in the case of a connection to a sewer system made under these provisions, a municipality (or a board of sanitary commissioners for the department of sanitation in certain municipalities) that owns or operates the sewer system to which the connection is made may waive the requirement that the property owner must release the property owner's right to remonstrate against pending or future annexations of the property owner's property by the municipality. Provides that a unit may not prohibit a property owner from installing a water service line or other water utility service infrastructure: (1) in or through a public right-of-way owned or controlled by the unit; and (2) for the purpose of connecting the owner's property to a waterworks owned or operated by a water utility other than a water utility owned or operated by the unit; if the property owner's property is served by a private water well, and if certain other conditions are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sewer and water connections. Provides that a unit may not prohibit a property owner from installing a sewer line or other sewage works: (1) in or through a public right-of-way owned or controlled by the unit; and (2) for the purpose of connecting the owner's property to a sewer system owned or operated by another unit or entity; if the owner provides to the unit a written determination from a specified authority that the owner's existing sewage disposal system is failing, and if certain other conditions are met. Provides that in the case of a connection to a sewer system made under these provisions, a municipality (or a board of sanitary commissioners for the department of sanitation in certain municipalities) that owns or operates the sewer system to which the connection is made may waive the requirement that the property owner must release the property owner's right to remonstrate against pending or future annexations of the property owner's property by the municipality. Provides that a unit may not prohibit a property owner from installing a water service line or other water utility service infrastructure: (1) in or through a public right-of-way owned or controlled by the unit; and (2) for the purpose of connecting the owner's property to a waterworks owned or operated by a water utility other than a water utility owned or operated by the unit; if the property owner's property is served by a private water well, and if certain other conditions are met.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenatePublic Law 150
2019-05-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 548: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-04-17SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-16HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 512: yeas 77, nays 13
2019-04-11HouseAmendment #3 (Pressel) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-11HouseReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-09HousePlaced back on second reading
2019-04-08HouseAmendment #1 (Pressel) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-08HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2019-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-28SenateSenator Koch added as second author
2019-01-28SenateCosponsor: Representative DeVon
2019-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Pressel
2019-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-01-24SenateAmendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2019-01-24SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-22SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/193/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/2/6/ec26aaea/SB0193.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/5/f/b05fb6e7/SB0193.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/1/3/3013e7f1/SB0193.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/b/d/a2bdbeb5/SB0193.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/1/f/9e1fdf18/SB0193.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/f/4/bff48b5b/SB0193.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/d/3/ebd3b772/SB0193.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/8/1/1181d314/SB0193.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/b/f/ccbfc67a/SB0193.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/e/b/4aebcba2/SB0193.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/0/8/42083284/SB0193.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/c/f/3bcf680d/SB0193.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/8/b/548b4106/SB0193.07.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/b/2/f0b2c1ad/SB0193.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/8/6/9186830d/SB0193.37.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/3/3/fe33bec8/SB0193.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/2/4/c32498ed/SB0193.512.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/e/b/e4eb3685/SB0193.548.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback