IN HB1330 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
Pending: Senate Commerce & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Return of lost pets to owners. Requires an animal care facility to adopt policies and procedures that govern the return of lost or stray dogs and cats to the dog's or cat's owner. Provides animal care policies and procedures that an animal care facility may include to return lost or stray dogs and cats to the dog's or cat's owner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Return of lost pets to owners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Wright added as coauthor
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Moed removed as coauthor
2020-01-23HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Busch
2020-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 91, nays 1
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseRepresentatives Moed and Cook added as coauthors
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2020-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Karickhoff
2020-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Hamilton

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback