IL SR1840 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May 29, 2016 as 529 College Savings Day in the State of Illinois to help raise awareness about the escalating costs of higher education and the importance of saving for college with the help of 529 college savings plans.
Title
529 COLLEGE SAVINGS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |