IL SR1273 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes that pornography harms the State and its citizens and further recognizes the need for education, prevention, research, and policy change at the community and societal level in order to address the epidemic of pornography that is harming the citizens of Illinois and the country as a whole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PORNOGRAPHY-EPIDEMIC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-13SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-13SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-13SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-13SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-02-13SenateSponsor Removed Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-13SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-08SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-01-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-17SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback