IL SR1196 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress and President Trump's administration to advocate for the permanent adoption of net neutrality rules that keep the Internet free and open.
Title
SUPPORT NET NEUTRALITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 13, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1196&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1196.htm |