IL SR1196 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 13, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the United States Congress and President Trump's administration to advocate for the permanent adoption of net neutrality rules that keep the Internet free and open.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUPPORT NET NEUTRALITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 13, 2018
2018-02-08SenateBe Adopted State Government; 006-000-000
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback