IL SR1088 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact tax incentives that would encourage rail carriers to utilize natural gas powered locomotives and grow LNG infrastructure.
Title
RAIL CARRIERS-NATURAL GAS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1088&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1088.htm |